NY S03985 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.
Title
Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.72 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.541 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2092b |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1687 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3985B |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3985A |
2019-06-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02092 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.72
A08352 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation
A08352 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation