NY S03982 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3053
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3053
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parole decisions to be published on a publicly accessible website within 60 days of such decision.
Title
Requires parole decisions to be published on a publicly accessible website within 60 days of such decision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3053 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1523 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03053 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - approval memo.17