NY A03053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires parole decisions to be published on a publicly accessible website within 60 days of such decision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires parole decisions to be published on a publicly accessible website within 60 days of such decision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senateapproval memo.17
2017-11-29Senatesigned chap.412
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1523
2017-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3982
2017-05-24SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2017-05-24Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-24Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.403
2017-05-16Assemblyreported
2017-02-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-25Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S03982 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3053

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03053&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03053&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03053
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03053&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03053&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03053&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A3053#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback