NY S03981 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a legal services veterans tax credit of up to $1,500 for any attorney who performs a minimum of fifty hours of pro bono legal services to a veteran or disabled veteran during a taxable year; provides that such services shall include, but not be limited to, veteran's benefits and appeals, military discharges and upgrades, public benefits, evictions and foreclosures, and consumer debt issues.
Title
Establishes a legal services veterans tax credit of up to $1,500 for any attorney who performs a minimum of fifty hours of pro bono legal services to a veteran or disabled veteran during a taxable year; provides that such services shall include, but not be limited to, veteran's benefits and appeals, military discharges and upgrades, public benefits, evictions and foreclosures, and consumer debt issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3981A |
2022-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A06572 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means