NY S03953 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-19 - SIGNED CHAP.496
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-19 - SIGNED CHAP.496
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "concussion management and awareness act"; directs the commissioners of education and health to adopt and implement rules and regulations for the treatment and monitoring of students with mild traumatic brain injuries; requires school personnel to receive training in mild traumatic brain injuries; such rules and regulations shall apply to school districts and boards of cooperative educational services; requires provisions of information pamphlet on mild traumatic brain injuries to parents of pupils participating in interscholastic sports or who have suffered a mild traumatic brain injury; requires written consent of and acknowledgment of receipt of such pamphlet by parents prior to participation in interscholastic sports; provides for the establishment of concussion management teams to implement such provisions.
Title
Enacts the "concussion management and awareness act"; directs the commissioners of education and health to adopt and implement rules and regulations for the treatment and monitoring of students with mild traumatic brain injuries; requires school personnel to receive training in mild traumatic brain injuries; such rules and regulations shall apply to school districts and boards of cooperative educational services; requires provisions of information pamphlet on mild traumatic brain injuries to parents of pupils participating in interscholastic sports or who have suffered a mild traumatic brain injury; requires written consent of and acknowledgment of receipt of such pamphlet by parents prior to participation in interscholastic sports; provides for the establishment of concussion management teams to implement such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.496 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.199 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a8194 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3953B |
2011-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 |
2011-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3953A |
2011-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08194 (Same As) 2011-06-14 - substituted by s3953b