NY S03934 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the state commission on prosecutorial conduct; provides that the commission shall investigate complaints and may make a recommendation to the governor that a prosecutor be removed; provides that the commission shall transmit its findings of fact and recommendations to the appellate division; provides that the appellate division may accept or reject such recommendations or impose a different sanction.
Title
Relates to the state commission on prosecutorial conduct; provides that the commission shall investigate complaints and may make a recommendation to the governor that a prosecutor be removed; provides that the commission shall transmit its findings of fact and recommendations to the appellate division; provides that the appellate division may accept or reject such recommendations or impose a different sanction.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1634 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.907 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01634 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - signed chap.153