NY A01634 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the state commission on prosecutorial conduct; provides that the commission shall investigate complaints and may make a recommendation to the governor that a prosecutor be removed; provides that the commission shall transmit its findings of fact and recommendations to the appellate division; provides that the appellate division may accept or reject such recommendations or impose a different sanction.
Title
Relates to the state commission on prosecutorial conduct; provides that the commission shall investigate complaints and may make a recommendation to the governor that a prosecutor be removed; provides that the commission shall transmit its findings of fact and recommendations to the appellate division; provides that the appellate division may accept or reject such recommendations or impose a different sanction.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Assembly | signed chap.153 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.907 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3934 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.51 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03934 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1634