NY S03928 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6091
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unemployment insurance extended benefits.
Title
Relates to unemployment insurance extended benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6091 |
2011-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.229 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06091 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - signed chap.7