NY S03926 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires general hospitals to provide notice to patients placed in observation services and explain the implications thereof.
Title
Requires general hospitals to provide notice to patients placed in observation services and explain the implications thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.397 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7257a |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3926A |
2013-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07257 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - substituted by s3926a