NY S03916 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a program fee option for graduate students.
Title
Provides a program fee option for graduate students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.529 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3916C |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED 3916B |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.826 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3916A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-02-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07241 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - print number 7241c