NY S03905 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Yonkers to adopt a local law creating a bureau of administrative adjudication for code and ordinance violations regarding conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Yonkers to adopt a local law creating a bureau of administrative adjudication for code and ordinance violations regarding conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10015
2012-05-31SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.902
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2011-03-09SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A03129 (Same As) 2012-04-26 - enacting clause stricken
A10015 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - signed chap.392

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback