NY A03129 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Yonkers to adopt a local law creating a bureau of administrative adjudication for code and ordinance violations regarding conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Title
Authorizes the city of Yonkers to adopt a local law creating a bureau of administrative adjudication for code and ordinance violations regarding conditions which constitute a threat or danger to the public health, safety or welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03905 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10015