NY S03893 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "employment first choice act" to ensure that an individual with developmental disabilities in a nonintegrated setting shall have the right to remain in such a setting under certain circumstances.
Title
Enacts the "employment first choice act" to ensure that an individual with developmental disabilities in a nonintegrated setting shall have the right to remain in such a setting under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1853 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3893B |
2015-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3893A |
2015-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2015-02-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05959 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to mental health