NY S03863 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3863A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3863A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a maximum $500 tax credit for taxpayer expenses, not compensated by insurance or otherwise, related to the purchase of a qualified hearing aid for the taxpayer or a dependent; limited to election once every three years.
Title
Provides a maximum $500 tax credit for taxpayer expenses, not compensated by insurance or otherwise, related to the purchase of a qualified hearing aid for the taxpayer or a dependent; limited to election once every three years.
Sponsors
Sen. James Alesi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3863A |
2012-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02884 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - print number 2884a