NY A02884 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 2884a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - print number 2884a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a maximum $500 tax credit for taxpayer expenses, not compensated by insurance or otherwise, related to the purchase of a qualified hearing aid for the taxpayer or a dependent; limited to election once every three years.
Title
Provides a maximum $500 tax credit for taxpayer expenses, not compensated by insurance or otherwise, related to the purchase of a qualified hearing aid for the taxpayer or a dependent; limited to election once every three years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Assembly | print number 2884a |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03863 (Same As) 2012-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3863A