NY S03854 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits correction officers to be color blind.
Title
Permits correction officers to be color blind.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.289 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.667 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08381 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction