NY S03852 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to items of appropriation.
Title
Relates to items of appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3852A |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |