NY S03841 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "short-term financial services loan act"; authorizes licensed cashers of checks to provide short-term loans under certain circumstances.
Title
Enacts the "short-term financial services loan act"; authorizes licensed cashers of checks to provide short-term loans under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2011-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3841A |
2011-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2011-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A05297 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - enacting clause stricken
A07047 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to banks
A07047 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to banks