NY S03815 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3815A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3815A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for accelerated payments to the city school district of the city of Mount Vernon.
Title
Provides for accelerated payments to the city school district of the city of Mount Vernon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3815A |
2012-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06581 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - print number 6581a