NY A06581 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - print number 6581a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - print number 6581a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for accelerated payments to the city school district of the city of Mount Vernon.
Title
Provides for accelerated payments to the city school district of the city of Mount Vernon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Assembly | print number 6581a |
2012-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | committed to education |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.214 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.222 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.222 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03815 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 3815A