NY S03809 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sealing records for certain proceedings that terminate in favor of the accused where the charges relate to the possession of marihuana.
Title
Relates to sealing records for certain proceedings that terminate in favor of the accused where the charges relate to the possession of marihuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02142 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES