NY A02142 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to sealing records for certain proceedings that terminate in favor of the accused where the charges relate to the possession of marihuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to sealing records for certain proceedings that terminate in favor of the accused where the charges relate to the possession of marihuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.158
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-02-14SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2017-02-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-02-14Assemblypassed assembly
2017-02-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.33
2017-01-30Assemblyreported
2017-01-17Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03809 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback