NY S03782 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to term limits for the office of governor; term limits for the offices of comptroller and attorney-general; limits the terms of office as a member of the legislature any person may serve.
Title
Relates to term limits for the office of governor; term limits for the offices of comptroller and attorney-general; limits the terms of office as a member of the legislature any person may serve.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |