NY S03766 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a mental hygiene legal service to patients or residents of residential healthcare facilities who have been admitted directly from a facility and who have a serious mental illness and are receiving services related to such illness.
Title
Provides a mental hygiene legal service to patients or residents of residential healthcare facilities who have been admitted directly from a facility and who have a serious mental illness and are receiving services related to such illness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.658 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1381 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3766 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.408 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4482 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1381 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04482 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - signed chap.658