NY S03736 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4835B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4835B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the reinstatement of prior approved work permits and waives certain requirements of general city law for homes devastated by Hurricane Sandy in the city of New York.
Title
Authorizes the reinstatement of prior approved work permits and waives certain requirements of general city law for homes devastated by Hurricane Sandy in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4835B |
2013-05-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3736B |
2013-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.199 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3736A |
2013-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2013-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04835 (Same As) 2013-07-11 - signed chap.100