NY S03704 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary exclusion on the requirement of plain language in consumer contracts from $100,000 to $250,000.
Title
Increases the monetary exclusion on the requirement of plain language in consumer contracts from $100,000 to $250,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Senate | signed chap.363 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.699 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3704 |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.151 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-06 | Senate | print number 2653a |
2019-03-06 | Senate | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2653A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.699 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02653 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - signed chap.363