NY S03697 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parole violators, after 10 days in a local correctional facility, to either be transferred to state correctional facilities or remain in such local facility with all associated costs borne by the state; provides for a 20-day extension period; provisions do not apply for NYC.
Title
Requires parole violators, after 10 days in a local correctional facility, to either be transferred to state correctional facilities or remain in such local facility with all associated costs borne by the state; provides for a 20-day extension period; provisions do not apply for NYC.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1291 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1001 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02314 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to correction