NY S03675 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that uniformed court officers and peace officers employed in the unified court system shall be entitled to accidental disability retirement if they sustain injuries as the result of a physical assault by an assailant suffered while in service.
Title
Provides that uniformed court officers and peace officers employed in the unified court system shall be entitled to accidental disability retirement if they sustain injuries as the result of a physical assault by an assailant suffered while in service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.262 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.77 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a4432 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.747 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04432 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.262