NY S03667 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the provision of assistance by port authority personnel, in any manner, to federal authorities in the enforcement of the US Executive Orders of January 27, 2017 and March 6, 2017, relating to foreign terrorist entry.
Title
Prohibits the provision of assistance by port authority personnel, in any manner, to federal authorities in the enforcement of the US Executive Orders of January 27, 2017 and March 6, 2017, relating to foreign terrorist entry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |