NY S03667 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the licensure of mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists and sets minimum work standards for mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the licensure of mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists and sets minimum work standards for mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.596
2014-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a5117c
2014-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2014-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-16SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3667D
2014-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3667C
2014-06-09SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3667B
2014-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1110
2014-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-06-17Assemblyreferred to economic development
2013-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1380
2013-06-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2013-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 3667A
2013-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2013-02-08SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A05117 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s3667d

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03667
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03667A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03667B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03667C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03667D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2013/S3667#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03667&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback