NY A05117 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s3667d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s3667d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensure of mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists and sets minimum work standards for mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists.
Title
Requires the licensure of mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists and sets minimum work standards for mold inspection, assessment and remediation specialists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3667d |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.596 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 5117c |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | print number 5117b |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reference changed to labor |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | print number 5117a |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S03667 (Same As) 2014-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR