NY S03666 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3666B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3666B
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "fair broadcast employment act of 2014" to authorize the use of certain contract provisions for the employment of key employees in the broadcast industry.
Title
Enacts the "fair broadcast employment act of 2014" to authorize the use of certain contract provisions for the employment of key employees in the broadcast industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3666B |
2014-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2014-04-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3666A |
2014-04-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2013-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06671 (Same As) 2014-04-14 - print number 6671a