NY A06671 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - print number 6671a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - print number 6671a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "fair broadcast employment act of 2014" to authorize the use of certain contract provisions for the employment of key employees in the broadcast industry.
Title
Enacts the "fair broadcast employment act of 2014" to authorize the use of certain contract provisions for the employment of key employees in the broadcast industry.
Sponsors
Asm. Carl Heastie [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Karim Camara [D] |
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Keith Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Assembly | print number 6671a |
2014-04-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03666 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 3666B