NY S03628 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to filing of an order imposing against revoked premises a proscription against future licensure.
Title
Relates to filing of an order imposing against revoked premises a proscription against future licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.576 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04537 (Same As) 2014-05-13 - held for consideration in economic development