NY S03596 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3596A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3596A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax checkoff box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research.
Title
Provides a tax checkoff box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Adams [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3596A |
2012-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03297 (Same As) 2012-05-14 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS