NY A03297 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-14 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a tax checkoff box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research.
Title
Provides a tax checkoff box on personal income tax return forms for gifts for the life pass it on trust fund for gifts for organ and tissue donation outreach and research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.546 |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | print number 3297a |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03596 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3596A