NY S03558 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalties for overtaking and passing a school bus; provides that for the first conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $350 nor more than $500; provides that for a second conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $500 nor more than $800; also provides that for a third conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $800 nor more than $1000.
Title
Increases the penalties for overtaking and passing a school bus; provides that for the first conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $350 nor more than $500; provides that for a second conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $500 nor more than $800; also provides that for a third conviction a person shall be punished by a fine of not less than $800 nor more than $1000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.487 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3558A |
2019-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02934 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation