NY S03526 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law.
Title
Authorizes payments to nonparticipating or nonpreferred providers of ambulance services licensed under article 30 of the public health law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.521 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.664 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06211 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes