NY S03524 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Title
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4610 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.246 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04610 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - tabled