NY A04610 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Title
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Phillip Goldfeder [D] | Asm. Michael Simanowitz [D] | Asm. Alfred Graf [R] |
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | tabled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.204 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3524 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.145 |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03524 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4610