NY S03498 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the posting of additional nursing home ratings; provides such posting shall include ratings for health inspections, staffing and quality measures.
Title
Relates to the posting of additional nursing home ratings; provides such posting shall include ratings for health inspections, staffing and quality measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2188 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1635 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02188 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - signed chap.336