NY S03484 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A47A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A47A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a person is guilty of facilitating female genitalia mutilation when such person intentionally aids the commission or attempted commission of a person circumcising, excising or infibulating female genitalia of a person less than 18 years old.
Title
Provides a person is guilty of facilitating female genitalia mutilation when such person intentionally aids the commission or attempted commission of a person circumcising, excising or infibulating female genitalia of a person less than 18 years old.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A47A |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.487 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3484A |
2016-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.990 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00047 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - signed chap.49