NY S03472 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires feminine hygiene products to be offered for free in non-public schools.
Title
Requires feminine hygiene products to be offered for free in non-public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1168 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A05158 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means