NY S03468 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of grants for the health workforce retraining program to grant recipients with health workforce retraining projects in multiple regions.
Title
Relates to the distribution of grants for the health workforce retraining program to grant recipients with health workforce retraining projects in multiple regions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.100 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04610 (Same As) 2014-05-13 - reported referred to ways and means