NY S03462 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for legislative review of rules and regulations and allows the legislature to invalidate regulations that are not consistent with the legislative intent.
Title
Provides for legislative review of rules and regulations and allows the legislature to invalidate regulations that are not consistent with the legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1030 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-02-06 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04758 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary