NY S03438 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires governmental and certain nongovernmental entities to publish public records proactively on the internet that are of public interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires governmental and certain nongovernmental entities to publish public records proactively on the internet that are of public interest.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-22SenateAMENDED 3438A
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1408
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-01-31SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06831 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - print number 6831a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback