CT SB00308 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement task force recommendations concerning timely wheelchair repair.
Title
An Act Concerning Wheelchair Repair Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 AS AMENDED (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 24-58 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | House | House Calendar Number 467 |
2024-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5257 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | File Number 311 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 212 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |