NY S03396 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the promotion of New York state animal and plant fiber and products made from such fiber.
Title
Provides for the promotion of New York state animal and plant fiber and products made from such fiber.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.285 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.205 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | substituted for a5380b |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-04-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3396A |
2021-04-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.418 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A05380 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - substituted by s3396a