NY S03365 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the disclosure of insurance information, including the name of the insurance company, the amount of coverage and what is covered under their plan, on permit applications for the construction of pipelines upon any freshwater wetlands.
Title
Requires the disclosure of insurance information, including the name of the insurance company, the amount of coverage and what is covered under their plan, on permit applications for the construction of pipelines upon any freshwater wetlands.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.486 |
2023-09-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.150 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | substituted for a3946 |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03946 (Same As) 2023-05-17 - substituted by s3365