NY A03946 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - substituted by s3365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - substituted by s3365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the disclosure of insurance information, including the name of the insurance company, the amount of coverage and what is covered under their plan, on permit applications for the construction of pipelines upon any freshwater wetlands.
Title
Requires the disclosure of insurance information, including the name of the insurance company, the amount of coverage and what is covered under their plan, on permit applications for the construction of pipelines upon any freshwater wetlands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Assembly | substituted by s3365 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.150 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03365 (Same As) 2023-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.486